PA SB703 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 45 (Legal Notices) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in publication and effectiveness of Commonwealth documents, further providing for Joint Committee on Documents.
Title
In publication and effectiveness of Commonwealth documents, further providing for Joint Committee on Documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04956 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 703 PN 843, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04956 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 703 PN 843, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-10 | House | In the House |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |