PA SB712 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys; in oil and gas wells, further providing for Oil and Gas Lease Fund; in transportation network companies, motor carrier companies and parking authority of a city of the first class, providing for transportation network company extension; in special funds, further providing for funding, for State Workers' Insurance Board, for expiration, for definitions, for other grants and for Commonwealth indebtedness; in additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for establishment of special fund and account, for use of fund, for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund, for Workers' Compensation Security Fund, for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications and providing for Enhanced Revenue Collection Account, Environmental Stewardship Fund and Recycling Fund; in general budget implementation, providing for block grants and for reports to General Assembly, further providing for Department of General Services, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Human Services, for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, for surcharges, for Multimodal Transportation Fund, for State Gaming Fund and providing for Joint Legislative Air and Water Pollution Control and Conservation Committee; in 2018-2019 budget implementation, further providing for Department of Revenue; adding provisions relating to 2019-2020 budget implementation; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Title
In Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys; in oil and gas wells, further providing for Oil and Gas Lease Fund; in transportation network companies, motor carrier companies and parking authority of a city of the first class, providing for transportation network company extension; in special funds, further providing for funding, for State Workers' Insurance Board, for expiration, for definitions, for other grants and for Commonwealth indebtedness; in additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for establishment of special fund and account, for use of fund, for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund, for Workers' Compensation Security Fund, for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications and providing for Enhanced Revenue Collection Account, Environmental Stewardship Fund and Recycling Fund; in general budget implementation, providing for block grants and for reports to General Assembly, further providing for Department of General Services, for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, for Department of Human Services, for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, for surcharges, for Multimodal Transportation Fund, for State Gaming Fund and providing for Joint Legislative Air and Water Pollution Control and Conservation Committee; in 2018-2019 budget implementation, further providing for Department of Revenue; adding provisions relating to 2019-2020 budget implementation; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 712 PN 1085, FP (Y: 125 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 712 PN 1085, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 175 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02603 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02615 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 712 PN 1085, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02588 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 712 PN 845, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: SB 712 PN 1085, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, CUTLER (Y: 175 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02603 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02615 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 712 PN 1085, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02588 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 712 PN 845, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 20 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (29-21) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (125-74) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-27 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-26 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-06-12 | House | In the House |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |