PA SB722 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, further providing for powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |