PA SB723 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Title
In high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 723 PN 944, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-09-23 | House | In the House |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |