PA SB724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes as follows: In Title 24: for retirement for school employees, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, contributions and benefits, further providing for payments by employers and providing for nonparticipating employer withdrawal liability and further providing for actuarial cost method; in School Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for vesting; in administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for Public School Employees Retirement Board; in administration and miscellaneous provisions, providing for the establishment of the Public Markets Emerging Investment Manager Program; and, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions. In Title 71: for retirement for State employees and officers, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits regarding administration of the State Employees' Retirement Fund, further providing for election to become a Class A-6 member or solely a participant in the plan and for eligibility for death benefits; and, in benefits, further providing for maximum single life annuity.
Title
Amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes as follows: In Title 24: for retirement for school employees, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in membership, contributions and benefits, further providing for payments by employers and providing for nonparticipating employer withdrawal liability and further providing for actuarial cost method; in School Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for vesting; in administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for Public School Employees Retirement Board; in administration and miscellaneous provisions, providing for the establishment of the Public Markets Emerging Investment Manager Program; and, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions. In Title 71: for retirement for State employees and officers, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for definitions; in membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits regarding administration of the State Employees' Retirement Fund, further providing for election to become a Class A-6 member or solely a participant in the plan and for eligibility for death benefits; and, in benefits, further providing for maximum single life annuity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 724 PN 1046, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 724 PN 1046, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02165 (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 724 PN 999, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 724 PN 1046, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02165 (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 724 PN 999, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 72 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |