PA SB727 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 13, 1988 (P.L.530, No.94), known as the Environmental Hearing Board Act, further providing for Environmental Hearing Board.
Title
Further providing for Environmental Hearing Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |