PA SB744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in inspection of vehicles, further providing for prohibition on expenditures for emission inspection program.
Title
In inspection of vehicles, further providing for prohibition on expenditures for emission inspection program.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] |
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 744 PN 1062, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-25 | House | In the House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-23) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |