PA SB746 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in inspection of vehicles, providing for date for emissions testing equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In inspection of vehicles, providing for date for emissions testing equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 746 PN 923, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-25HouseIn the House
2019-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (33-17)
2019-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-06-10SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback