PA SB748 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 50 in Independence Township, Washington County, as the Lt. Col. Juanita L. Warman Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 50 in Independence Township, Washington County, as the Lt. Col. Juanita L. Warman Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |