PA SB778 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 74 (Transportation) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sustainable mobility options, further providing for Public Transportation Trust Fund; and, in Pennsylvania Turnpike, further providing for definitions.
Title
In sustainable mobility options, further providing for Public Transportation Trust Fund; and, in Pennsylvania Turnpike, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 778 PN 1064, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-25 | House | In the House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |