PA SB79 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bases of jurisdiction and interstate and international procedure, providing for foreign depositions and subpoenas; and repealing provisions relating to foreign depositions.
Title
In bases of jurisdiction and interstate and international procedure, providing for foreign depositions and subpoenas; and repealing provisions relating to foreign depositions.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Shirley Kitchen [D] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - Senate - SB 79 PN 2431, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 79 PN 2431, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - SB 79 PN 64, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - House - SB 79 PN 2431, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - SB 79 PN 64, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 183 |
2012-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2012-10-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-03 | House | Second consideration |
2012-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2012-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2012-10-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-03-08 | House | In the House |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-01-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |