PA SB79 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 2014 (P.L.876, No.98), entitled "An act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 15 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, Carroll Township, York County, as the Glenn Bowers Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of 17th Street over the 10th Avenue Expressway, City of Altoona, Blair County, as the Blair County Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 764 over 31st Street, City of Altoona, Blair County, as the Alvin E. Morrison Memorial Bridge; designating West Erie Avenue from its intersection with North Second Street in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, to the point where it meets North Front Street in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, as Roberto Clemente Way; designating the interchange at the crossing of State Route 33 and Main Street (State Route 1022) in Palmer Township, Northampton County, as the Charles Chrin Interchange; designating the interchange between the portion of State Route 3009 and State Route 119 in South Union Township, Fayette County, as the Fred L. Lebder Interchange; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 711 over the Youghiogheny River in the City of Connellsville, Fayette County, as the Officer Robb McCray Memorial Bridge," further providing for Officer Robb McCray Memorial Bridge.
Title
Amending the act of July 2, 2014 (P.L.876, No.98), entitled "An act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 15 over the Yellow Breeches Creek, Carroll Township, York County, as the Glenn Bowers Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of 17th Street over the 10th Avenue Expressway, City of Altoona, Blair County, as the Blair County Veterans Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 764 over 31st Street, City of Altoona, Blair County, as the Alvin E. Morrison Memorial Bridge; designating West Erie Avenue from its intersection with North Second Street in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, to the point where it meets North Front Street in Philadelphia City, Philadelphia County, as Roberto Clemente Way; designating the interchange at the crossing of State Route 33 and Main Street (State Route 1022) in Palmer Township, Northampton County, as the Charles Chrin Interchange; designating the interchange between the portion of State Route 3009 and State Route 119 in South Union Township, Fayette County, as the Fred L. Lebder Interchange; and designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 711 over the Youghiogheny River in the City of Connellsville, Fayette County, as the Officer Robb McCray Memorial Bridge," further providing for Officer Robb McCray Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: SB 79 PN 55, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 79 PN 55, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: SB 79 PN 55, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 79 PN 55, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Act No. 4 |
2015-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-05-06 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed in House |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2015-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-01-27 | House | In the House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |