PA SB790 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Veto No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Veto No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to conventional wells and the development of oil, gas and coal; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Environmental Protection; providing for preliminary provisions, for general requirements, for enforcement and remedies, for related funds and for miscellaneous provisions; and making an appropriation.
Title
Relating to conventional wells and the development of oil, gas and coal; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Environmental Protection; providing for preliminary provisions, for general requirements, for enforcement and remedies, for related funds and for miscellaneous provisions; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 790 PN 1446, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Floor: SB 790 PN 1446, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04433 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 790 PN 1051, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Floor: SB 790 PN 1446, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04433 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 790 PN 1051, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Veto No. 17 |
2020-11-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (29-19) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-93) |
2020-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-15 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-10-21 | House | In the House |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (26-23) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |