PA SB792 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for repair obligations, for manufacturer's duty for refund or replacement and for presumption of a reasonable number of attempts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 792 PN 2074, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2020-11-17 | House | In the House |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |