PA SB793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in commercial drivers, further providing for requirement for commercial driver's license; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges and for conditions of permits and security for damages.
Title
In commercial drivers, further providing for requirement for commercial driver's license; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for restrictions on use of highways and bridges and for conditions of permits and security for damages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 793 PN 1765, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 793 PN 1765, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 793 PN 1765, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-10-20 | House | In the House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Final passage (31-17) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-16) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |