PA SB798 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 7, 1982 (P.L.784, No.225), known as the Dog Law, in short title and definitions, further providing for definitions; in dangerous dogs, further providing for court proceedings, certificate of registration and disposition and for requirements; and making an editorial change.
Title
In short title and definitions, further providing for definitions; in dangerous dogs, further providing for court proceedings, certificate of registration and disposition and for requirements; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. John Sabatina [D] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 798 PN 1409, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-06-08 | House | In the House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |