PA SB809 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Judicial Conduct Board, further providing for staff and operations and establishing the Pennsylvania Commission on Legislative Conduct.
Title
In Judicial Conduct Board, further providing for staff and operations and establishing the Pennsylvania Commission on Legislative Conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |