PA SB81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in marriage license, further providing for restrictions on issuance of license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In marriage license, further providing for restrictions on issuance of license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 81 PN 55, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-25HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-10-22HouseIn the House
2019-10-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-09-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-09-24SenateRemoved from table
2019-09-24SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-01-23SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback