PA SB810 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in boards and offices, providing for information technology; establishing the Office of Information Technology and the Information Technology Fund; providing for administrative and procurement procedures and for the Joint Cybersecurity Oversight Committee; imposing duties on the Office of Information Technology; providing for administration of Pennsylvania Statewide Radio Network and imposing penalties.
Title
In boards and offices, providing for information technology; establishing the Office of Information Technology and the Information Technology Fund; providing for administrative and procurement procedures and for the Joint Cybersecurity Oversight Committee; imposing duties on the Office of Information Technology; providing for administration of Pennsylvania Statewide Radio Network and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 810 PN 1398, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-10-06 | House | In the House |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-21) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |