PA SB841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-20 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 35 (Health and Safety) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the Health Care Cost Containment Council, for its powers and duties, for health care cost containment through the collection and dissemination of data, for public accountability of health care costs and for health care for the indigent; providing for COVID-19 disaster emergency; in local organizations and services, further providing for general authority of political subdivisions; and, in Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the Health Care Cost Containment Council, for its powers and duties, for health care cost containment through the collection and dissemination of data, for public accountability of health care costs and for health care for the indigent; providing for COVID-19 disaster emergency; in local organizations and services, further providing for general authority of political subdivisions; and, in Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: SB 841 PN 1623, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 841 PN 1623, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 841 PN 1410, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: SB 841 PN 1397, 2019 A4067, CUTLER (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03905 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 841 PN 1338, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-20HouseAct No. 15
2020-04-20HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-04-16HousePresented to the Governor
2020-04-16HouseSigned in House
2020-04-15HouseSigned in Senate
2020-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (202-0)
2020-04-14HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-04-07HouseReferred to RULES
2020-04-07HouseIn the House
2020-04-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0)
2020-04-06SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2019-12-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-12-16SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-12-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-11-21HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments (185-0)
2019-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-19HouseReported as amended
2019-10-31HouseReferred to HEALTH
2019-10-30HouseIn the House
2019-10-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-10-29SenateAmended on third consideration
2019-10-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-29SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-29SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-28SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-28SenateReported as amended
2019-09-03SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=841
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1151
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1323
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1338
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1397
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1410
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0841&pn=1623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=591
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=10/28/2019&RollCallId=611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1401
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/19/2019&RollCallId=1402
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=926
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=958
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=04/06/2020&RollCallId=778
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=418
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=04/14/2020&RollCallId=1773

Bill Comments

feedback