PA SB85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 7, 1982 (P.L.784, No.225), known as the Dog Law, in licenses, tags and kennels, further providing for transfer of dog licenses or tags and other licensing requirements and for service dogs and dogs used by municipal or State Police departments.
Title
In licenses, tags and kennels, further providing for transfer of dog licenses or tags and other licensing requirements and for service dogs and dogs used by municipal or State Police departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 85 PN 2004, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-09-22 | House | In the House |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |