PA SB851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, in short title and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in sale of property, further providing for repurchase by owner and providing for limitation on trusteeship and for ownership interests and responsibilities of delinquent property owner.
Title
In short title and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in sale of property, further providing for repurchase by owner and providing for limitation on trusteeship and for ownership interests and responsibilities of delinquent property owner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 851 PN 1795, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 851 PN 1795, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06231 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 851 PN 1150, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 851 PN 1795, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06231 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 851 PN 1150, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Act No. 38 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2018-01-23 | House | In the House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |