PA SB857 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for accountability to Commonwealth taxpayers.
Title
In reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for accountability to Commonwealth taxpayers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - SB 857 PN 882, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-05-10 | House | In the House |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-2) |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-04-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-22 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |