PA SB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for newborn protection; in child protective services, further providing for definitions and for taking child into protective custody; and, in newborn protection, further providing for definitions and for incubators for newborns, providing for health care providers at urgent care centers accepting newborns and further providing for reporting acceptance of newborns, for immunity and for duties of department.
Title
In offenses against the family, further providing for newborn protection; in child protective services, further providing for definitions and for taking child into protective custody; and, in newborn protection, further providing for definitions and for incubators for newborns, providing for health care providers at urgent care centers accepting newborns and further providing for reporting acceptance of newborns, for immunity and for duties of department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 86 PN 485, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Senate Bill 86 PN -1 - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Senate Bill 86 PN -1 - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-03-26 | House | In the House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |