PA SB869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for moment of silence on September 11 anniversary and for moment of silence on December 7, Pearl Harbor Day.
Title
In terms and courses of study, further providing for moment of silence on September 11 anniversary and for moment of silence on December 7, Pearl Harbor Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07402 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 869 PN 1937, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07402 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 869 PN 1937, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2020-10-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-09-14 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-09-09 | House | In the House |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-01 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |