PA SB892 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 16, 1986 (P.L.1646, No.188), known as the Chiropractic Practice Act, in licensure and regulation, further providing for license required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensure and regulation, further providing for license required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 892 PN 1533, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: SB 892 PN 1533, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A05920 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 892 PN 1259, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateAct No. 67
2018-06-28SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22SenateSigned in House
2018-06-21SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2018-06-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-19SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2018-06-18SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-13HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-11HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-09HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-14HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-14HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-14HouseReported as amended
2017-12-19HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-12-13HouseIn the House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-12-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-10-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-23SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-17SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-17SenateReported as amended
2017-09-25SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=892
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0892&pn=1195
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0892&pn=1259
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0892&pn=1533
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/17/2017&RollCallId=483
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=03/14/2018&RollCallId=1338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=03/14/2018&RollCallId=1339
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=1704
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1002
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=577

Bill Comments

feedback