PA SB906 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 20, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.96, No.6), known as the Mental Health and Intellectual Disability Act of 1966, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in responsibilities of the State, providing for State center closure moratorium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in responsibilities of the State, providing for State center closure moratorium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 906 PN 1447, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: SB 906 PN 1447, FP (Y: 139 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: SB 906 PN 1435, 2019 A4474, D. MILLER (Y: 32 N: 164 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: SB 906 PN 1435, 2019 A4445, JAMES (Y: 179 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04054 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 906 PN 1327, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseBill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
2020-02-12HouseIn the Senate
2020-02-12SenateVeto No. 1
2020-02-12SenateVetoed by the Governor
2020-02-03SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-02-03SenateSigned in House
2020-01-27SenateSigned in Senate
2020-01-27SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (28-21)
2020-01-27SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-01-27SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-01-15SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (139-55)
2020-01-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-14HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-14HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-01-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-17HouseReported as amended
2019-11-19HouseReferred to HEALTH
2019-11-18HouseIn the House
2019-11-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (40-9)
2019-10-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-10-28SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-28SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-22SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-22SenateReported as amended
2019-10-18SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=906
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0906&pn=1259
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0906&pn=1287
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0906&pn=1327
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0906&pn=1435
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0906&pn=1447
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=550
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=593
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=12/17/2019&RollCallId=1500
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=12/17/2019&RollCallId=1501
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1030
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/15/2020&RollCallId=1630
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=01/27/2020&RollCallId=706

Bill Comments

feedback