PA SB908 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for scope of subchapter, for legislative findings and declaration of purpose, for definitions, for assistance to volunteer fire companies, ambulance service and rescue squads, for Volunteer Companies Loan Fund, for powers and duties of office, for disposition and use of proceeds, for Volunteer Company Loan Sinking Fund and investments, for repayment obligations for principal and interest, for temporary financing authorization, for authorization of contracts, reimbursement procedure and amount and for reimbursement procedure and amount, providing for referendum to expand loan assistance and for annual report and distribution of information and further providing for Pennsylvania Volunteer Loan Assistance Program; in volunteer firefighters, further providing for definitions, for statement of purpose, for funds and for audits and providing for fire relief formula study; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for special provisions; and making an editorial changes.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for scope of subchapter, for legislative findings and declaration of purpose, for definitions, for assistance to volunteer fire companies, ambulance service and rescue squads, for Volunteer Companies Loan Fund, for powers and duties of office, for disposition and use of proceeds, for Volunteer Company Loan Sinking Fund and investments, for repayment obligations for principal and interest, for temporary financing authorization, for authorization of contracts, reimbursement procedure and amount and for reimbursement procedure and amount, providing for referendum to expand loan assistance and for annual report and distribution of information and further providing for Pennsylvania Volunteer Loan Assistance Program; in volunteer firefighters, further providing for definitions, for statement of purpose, for funds and for audits and providing for fire relief formula study; in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for special provisions; and making an editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 908 PN 1469, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-01-28 | House | In the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |