PA SB91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, in industry partnerships, further providing for definitions, for industry clusters, for interdepartmental cooperation and for industry and labor market research and providing for dissemination of industry and labor market research to educational institutions.
Title
In industry partnerships, further providing for definitions, for industry clusters, for interdepartmental cooperation and for industry and labor market research and providing for dissemination of industry and labor market research to educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |