PA SB910 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for establishment, for publication and notice, for award of grants, for consolidation incentive, for establishment, for publication and notice and for award of grants, providing for consolidation incentive, further providing for Fire Company Grant Program, for Emergency Medical Services Company Grant Program, for additional funding, for allocation of appropriated funds and for expiration of authority and providing for annual reports.
Title
In grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for definitions, for establishment, for publication and notice, for award of grants, for consolidation incentive, for establishment, for publication and notice and for award of grants, providing for consolidation incentive, further providing for Fire Company Grant Program, for Emergency Medical Services Company Grant Program, for additional funding, for allocation of appropriated funds and for expiration of authority and providing for annual reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 910 PN 1470, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-01-28 | House | In the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |