PA SB92 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, further providing for exemptions and special provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 243 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |