PA SB932 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for fireworks; in volunteer firefighters, further providing for definitions.
Title
Providing for fireworks; in volunteer firefighters, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 932 PN 1856, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 932 PN 1358, A6515, BROWNE AMENDMENT NO. A-6515 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 932 PN 1358, A6515, BROWNE AMENDMENT NO. A-6515 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-07-15 | House | In the House |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (48-2) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |