PA SB934 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for right to enter and inspect.
Title
In departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for right to enter and inspect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1720, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1720, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05826 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1515, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1720, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05826 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1515, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Act No. 62 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-10 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2020-04-29 | House | In the House |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |