PA SB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in additional coverages, further providing for the definition of "employe"; and making editorial changes.
Title
In additional coverages, further providing for the definition of "employe"; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 94 PN 2101, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 94 PN 2101, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 94 PN 2037, 2019 A7493, HARKINS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07368 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 94 PN 940, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 94 PN 2101, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 94 PN 2101, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 94 PN 2037, 2019 A7493, HARKINS (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07368 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 94 PN 940, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 108 |
2020-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2020-02-03 | House | In the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |