PA SB952 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' preference, repealing provisions relating to soldier defined, providing for purpose and for definitions, repealing provisions relating to credits in civil service examinations, further providing for additional points in grading civil service examinations, for preference in appointment or promotion, for lack of training, age or physical impairment, for preferential rating provision in public works specifications, for computation of seniority for reduction in force, for preference of spouses and for law exclusive and providing for reporting requirement and for guidelines; and, in voluntary veterans' preference in private employment, further providing for definitions and for eligibility for preference.
Title
In veterans' preference, repealing provisions relating to soldier defined, providing for purpose and for definitions, repealing provisions relating to credits in civil service examinations, further providing for additional points in grading civil service examinations, for preference in appointment or promotion, for lack of training, age or physical impairment, for preferential rating provision in public works specifications, for computation of seniority for reduction in force, for preference of spouses and for law exclusive and providing for reporting requirement and for guidelines; and, in voluntary veterans' preference in private employment, further providing for definitions and for eligibility for preference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 952 PN 2043, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 952 PN 2043, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: SB 952 PN 1949, 2019 A7413, BARRAR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A07110 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 952 PN 1757, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 952 PN 2043, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 952 PN 2043, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: SB 952 PN 1949, 2019 A7413, BARRAR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A07110 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 952 PN 1757, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 102 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-0) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-06-09 | House | In the House |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |