PA SB957 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veteran-owned small businesses, providing for miscellaneous provisions; imposing a penalty; and making an editorial change.
Title
In veteran-owned small businesses, providing for miscellaneous provisions; imposing a penalty; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 957 PN 1402, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 957 PN 1402, A6343, IOVINO AMENDMENT NO. A-6343 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 957 PN 1402, A6343, IOVINO AMENDMENT NO. A-6343 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-06-22 | House | In the House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |