PA SB958 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in manufacture and supply of electricity, further providing for specific powers.
Title
In manufacture and supply of electricity, further providing for specific powers.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Maria Collett [D] | Sen. Lindsey Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |