PA SB987 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for definitions and for State Fire Commissioner, providing for curriculum and training, further providing for Pennsylvania State Fire Academy and for Fire Safety Advisory Committee.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for definitions and for State Fire Commissioner, providing for curriculum and training, further providing for Pennsylvania State Fire Academy and for Fire Safety Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 987 PN 1822, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 987 PN 1450, A6287, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-6287 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 987 PN 1450, A6287, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-6287 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-06-30 | House | In the House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-16) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (29-21) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |