PA SB995 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Laughlin [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 995 PN 1460, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 995 PN 1460, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 995 PN 1460, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 995 PN 1460, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Act No. 103 |
2020-10-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-20 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-30 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-17 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-06-09 | House | In the House |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |