PA SB997 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits, providing for election to purchase nonintervening military service; and, in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for construction of part.
Title
In membership, credited service, classes of service and eligibility for benefits, providing for election to purchase nonintervening military service; and, in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for construction of part.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 997 PN 1465, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 997 PN 1465, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 997 PN 1465, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 997 PN 1465, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 55 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-04-21 | House | In the House |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |