PA SR140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to ensure the United States Department of Veterans Affairs sufficiently implements the letter and spirit of the VA Maintaining Internal Systems and Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks (MISSION) Act of 2018 and provide veterans in this Commonwealth with the care they have earned for their military service.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to ensure the United States Department of Veterans Affairs sufficiently implements the letter and spirit of the VA Maintaining Internal Systems and Strengthening Integrated Outside Networks (MISSION) Act of 2018 and provide veterans in this Commonwealth with the care they have earned for their military service.
Sponsors
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |