PA SR170 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Amended and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Amended and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution establishing a task force on services for veterans, including the coordination of services in this Commonwealth among Federal, State, local and nonprofit programs aimed at serving veterans, and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to the task force and conduct a comprehensive review and analysis of services for veterans.
Title
Establishing a task force on services for veterans, including the coordination of services in this Commonwealth among Federal, State, local and nonprofit programs aimed at serving veterans, and directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to the task force and conduct a comprehensive review and analysis of services for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Amended and Adopted |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |