PA SR336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution observing June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Observing June 19, 2020, as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |