PA SR346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating July 25, 2020, August 22, 2020, September 26, 2020, October 24, 2020, and December 19, 2020, as "Small Business Days" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating July 25, 2020, August 22, 2020, September 26, 2020, October 24, 2020, and December 19, 2020, as "Small Business Days" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |