RI H5016 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education And Employment Opportunities (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities From April 30, 2020, And Its Expiration Date To July 30, 2020.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education And Employment Opportunities (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities From April 30, 2020, And Its Expiration Date To July 30, 2020.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2019-02-28HouseHouse read and passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/28/2019)
2019-02-07HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019)
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback