RI H5028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public utilities or utility facilities to repave and repair roadways altered or excavated by them to the satisfaction of state or municipalities providing financial recovery for defective incomplete repairs.
Title
The Rhode Island Utility Fair Share Roadway Repair Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |