RI H5033 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that a program of financial literacy be taught to all students in the public high schools throughout the state of Rhode Island.
Title
Financial Literacy
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-17 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |