RI H5035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a special motor vehicle registration plate for The Rose Island Lighthouse Foundation, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-04-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/25/2019)
2019-04-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-04-03HouseProposed Substitute
2019-03-29HouseScheduled for consideration (04/04/2019)
2019-02-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-02-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019)
2019-02-15HouseCommittee transferred to House Special Legislation
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback