RI H5036 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the existing disability business enterprises program by allowing Veterans' Affairs, the Social Security Administration and others to verify that a business owner has a disability and is eligible for the current program.
Title
Disability Business Enterprises
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5036.pdf |