RI H5041 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies amendments to Coventry Home Rule Charter adopted and approved at the November 4, 2014 general election.
Title
Relating To The Town Of Coventry
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/31/2015) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2015-02-24 | House | House read and passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-02-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/12/2015) |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2015) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |